Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 03:42:14 (UTC).

STELLA ABEDIAN, ET AL. VS 1234 VIOLA LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 STELLA ABEDIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against 1234 VIOLA LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1381

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABEDIAN STELLA

ARAKELIAN ANDRE

ABEDIAN MINELI

Defendants

KELLZI KRIKOR

1234 VIOLA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/8/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stella Abedian (Plaintiff); Andre Arakelian (Plaintiff); Mineli Abedian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stella Abedian (Plaintiff); Andre Arakelian (Plaintiff); Mineli Abedian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stella Abedian (Plaintiff); Andre Arakelian (Plaintiff); Mineli Abedian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE