This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 03:05:41 (UTC).

STAUB, MIRIAM VS STAUB, KENNETH

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 STAUB, MIRIAM filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against STAUB, KENNETH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUNA, ANA MARIA and THOMAS, HOLLY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9748

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUNA, ANA MARIA

THOMAS, HOLLY A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STAUB MIRIAM

Respondent

STAUB KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRYAN SHARON ANN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/11/2020: Minute Order

170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge

8/23/2019: 170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge

Minute Order

8/30/2019: Minute Order

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

9/17/2019: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service - Personal *Mtn to quash svc of summons & Dismiss petn for legal seprtn

9/20/2019: Proof of Service - Personal *Mtn to quash svc of summons & Dismiss petn for legal seprtn

Proof of Service - Mail

11/12/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

Notice - Continuance - Motion to quash service of summons and dismiss petition for legal separation, etc, filed Sept 17 2019

11/22/2019: Notice - Continuance - Motion to quash service of summons and dismiss petition for legal separation, etc, filed Sept 17 2019

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

12/2/2019: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/19/2019: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Request - evidentiary hrg

1/23/2020: Request - evidentiary hrg

Proof of Service

1/23/2020: Proof of Service

Request

1/29/2020: Request

Reply

1/29/2020: Reply

Minute Order

2/5/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Amended (1st) - petition changed from legal separation to dissolution of marriage; #2a - petitioner added in residence requirement; #5a - legal grounds changed to divorce on irreconcilable

3/13/2020: Petition - Amended (1st) - petition changed from legal separation to dissolution of marriage; #2a - petitioner added in residence requirement; #5a - legal grounds changed to divorce on irreconcilable

Notice - Continuance

3/25/2020: Notice - Continuance

Notice - Continuance

3/25/2020: Notice - Continuance

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

4/1/2020: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 2B at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2B, Thomas, Holly A., Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2B, Thomas, Holly A., Presiding; Request for Order - Other - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2B, Thomas, Holly A., Presiding; Request for Order - Other - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice - Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Family Law (RE Other: Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Dismiss Petition for Legal Separation - See item #8 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 88, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Reassigned - Other Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRYAN SHARON ANN