This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 15:24:38 (UTC).

STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE VS LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2688

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE

Defendants

LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC.

LINCOLN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDOVAL KATHERINE ANN

Defendant Attorney

NICK JACK CLIFFORD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

9/26/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Disassociation of Attorney

7/21/2022: Disassociation of Attorney

Answer

7/26/2022: Answer

Notice of Related Case

9/6/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 09/08/2022

9/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 09/08/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

9/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/14/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/14/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/14/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/14/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2025
  • Hearing04/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: State National Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Lincoln Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of 09/08/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV13671, 22STCV12688 are related; case number 22STCV12688 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV13671, 22STCV12688 are related; case number 22STCV12688 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Lincoln Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Lincoln Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State National Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Lincoln Transport Phoenix, Inc. (Defendant); Lincoln Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State National Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Lincoln Transport Phoenix, Inc. (Defendant); Lincoln Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State National Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Lincoln Transport Phoenix, Inc. (Defendant); Lincoln Transportation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN TRANSPORT PHOENIX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Transportation Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDOVAL KATHERINE A. ESQ.