This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 01:25:42 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS VINCE VACA

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against VINCE VACA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4012

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

VACA VINCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorney

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Hearing12/21/2021 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vince Vaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Vince Vaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vince Vaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Vince Vaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORROMEO IRENE G.