This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 05:28:00 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SAMMANTHA JARRETT

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAMMANTHA JARRETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5175

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JARRETT SAMMANTHA AKA SAMMANTHA CHYANNE JARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/10/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2022: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

3/24/2022: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice As To The Entire Action); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M