Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:46:46 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS NICHOLAS

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICHOLAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4762

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants and Respondents

MARTIN NICHOLAS ANDREW

DOES I TO V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation

1/8/2019: Stipulation

Order

2/15/2019: Order

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANDREW MARTIN TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/15/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANDREW MARTIN TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

9/5/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/5/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Order (Dismissal); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (For Entry of Judgment); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANDREW MARTIN TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC674762    Hearing Date: April 22, 2021    Dept: 29

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.  vs.  Martin 

MOTION

Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) move to enforce a settlement agreement with Defendant Nicholas Andrew Martin (“Defendant”) is GRANTED.

Defendant has not opposed the motion.

ANALYSIS

Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 provides that “[i]f parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 664.6.) In ruling on a motion to enter judgment, the court acts as a trier of fact. The court must determine whether the parties entered into a valid and binding settlement. To do so, the court may receive oral testimony in addition to declarations. (Kohn v. Jaymar-Ruby, Inc. (1994) 23 Cal.App.4th 1530, 1533.)

Under Paragraph 11 of the Parties settlement agreement, The Defendant agreed to settle with Plaintiffs via a written settlement agreement. Defendant made payments in sum of $,2,500.00 and Alliance United Insurance Company paid Plaintiff $5,000 on behalf of Defendant. There is a balance of $2,500.00 and a Notice of Default was entered. Paragraph 11 of the settlement agreement invokes that if a dismissal action is filed, the Court has jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement pursuant to 664.6. The Court expressly retained jurisdiction to enforce the settlement in its order dismissing the action on February 15, 2019.

Plaintiffs advance evidence of the settlement agreement (Motion to Set Aside, Dismissal, Exhibit 1); , Declaration of attorney Susan Benson whose office sent the default payment letter to the Defendant (Benson decl. Par. 6);, and provided a timeline of the Defendant complying and then defaulting with and upon the terms of the settlement agreement. Id. At 4:15-26. Plaintiffs also advanced a Notice of (Default Motion to Set Aside Dismissal, Exhibit 2). The Plaintiff has admitted a sufficient amount of evidence proving their settlement agreement with Defendant. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. The Court enters judgment against Defendant per the terms of the settlement agreements. The Court enters a judgment of $21,301.07 pursuant to the terms of the settlement agreement and based on the facts in paragraph 8 of Susan Benson’s declaration.

Plaintiffs to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M