This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 00:11:47 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DAVID PARKER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID PARKER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2167

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LILY TRANSPORTATION CORP.

PARKER DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESPINOSA TRISTAN P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/19/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VENUE

1/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VENUE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/10/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

8/31/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF VENUE); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less