This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 15:08:17 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2438

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLEASANT JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/18/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VENUE

11/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VENUE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/1/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2024
  • Hearing11/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (declaration of venue); Filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT