This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:01:10 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO VS ARACELY ARREDON

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARACELY ARREDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7636

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 100

ARREDONDO ARACELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MENDELSON LEE M. ESQ.

MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/13/2017: SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

4/13/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

4/19/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration in Support of Request for Enrty of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d) & CCP 1033); Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Jack Yadegar in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to [C.C.P. 585(d) & C.C.P. 1033]); Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 01/03/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less