Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 04:26:00 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS SAMSUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SAMSUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0063

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SAMSUNG INTERNATIONAL INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/18/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/19/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/4/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); SAMSUNG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAMSUNG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILLEMER DAVID B.