Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 05:13:20 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER DAVID B.

Defendant Attorney

GRANATA VALERIA

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, MEMO OF PA; DECLARATION OF DAVID B. PILLEMER

5/25/2021: Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, MEMO OF PA; DECLARATION OF DAVID B. PILLEMER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/12/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Hearing08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Hearing07/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend to File a First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave (to File a First Amended Complaint, Memo of PA; Declaration of David B. Pillemer); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANATA VALERIA