This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:30:21 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS HOSE MAN INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOSE MAN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1242

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

HOSE-MAN INC

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL SERVICES INC

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL SERVICES INC.

HOSE-MAN INC.

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HOSE-MAN INC.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SELLER JANICE MATLIN ESQ.

BENSON LEGAL APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PRIDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.

WEINSTEIN MARK A. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AMOUNT OF DEMAND: $44,101 .80

2/23/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AMOUNT OF DEMAND: $44,101 .80

SUMMONS

2/23/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/3/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/3/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

5/3/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/12/2017: SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

5/31/2017: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/1/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • at 2:00 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • at 02:00 pm in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (INCORRECT NAME: Southwest Mechanical Services, Inc. TRUE NAME: Southwest Mechanical, Inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Hose-Man, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service (summons and complaint ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AMOUNT OF DEMAND: $44,101 .80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOSE-MAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant