This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 03:49:39 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS BETTY WEIS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BETTY WEIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3634

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

WEIS BETTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ MARC A ESQ

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/20/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2024
  • Hearing07/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.