Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 00:35:33 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS ASHISH PARIKH

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ASHISH PARIKH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8133

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PARIKH ASHISH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOURO JENNY R

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/21/2019: Unknown

Other -

2/21/2019: Other -

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons

12/11/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

12/11/2018: Unknown

Declaration

12/11/2018: Declaration

Complaint

12/11/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (OF VENUE); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOURO JENNY ROSE