This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:17:33 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS ALFRED ARRENDELL, II

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALFRED ARRENDELL, II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5822

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ARRENDELL ALFRED II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELLER JANICE M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • Hearing05/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELLER JANICE M.