This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2020 at 10:42:35 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS AIR VENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AIR VENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, SAMANTHA JESSNER and WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8321

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

SAMANTHA JESSNER

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 40

DM(ASIA) LIMITED

AIR VENT INC.

POWERMAX ELECTRIC CO. LTD. (DOE 1)

KINGS OF FANS INC. (DOE 2)

KINGS OF FANS INC. DOE 2

POWERMAX ELECTRIC CO. LTD. DOE 1

DMASIA LIMITED

CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO. LTD

CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO. LTD INC

LIMITED GUANGDONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PILLEMER DAVID B. ESQ.

PILLEMER DAVID BERNARD ESQ.

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CLINTON & CLINTON

O'DAY DALLAS JOHN

REEDER DAVID R

STEPAN CHAD J.

BRIDGES DAVID E.

SAYRE JONATHON D.

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

O'DAY DALLAS JOHN

REEDER DAVID R

STEPAN CHAD J.

BRIDGES DAVID E.

SAYRE JONATHON D.

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER ON APPLICATION OF DEFT, KING OF FANS, INC., DEFENDANT CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., INC., AND MEAGHER & GEER, PLLP FOR AND ORDER ADMITTING DAVID E. BRDIGES, ESQ. AND CHAD J. STEPAN, E

11/8/2019: Order - ORDER ON APPLICATION OF DEFT, KING OF FANS, INC., DEFENDANT CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., INC., AND MEAGHER & GEER, PLLP FOR AND ORDER ADMITTING DAVID E. BRDIGES, ESQ. AND CHAD J. STEPAN, E

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR AN ORDER AD...)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR AN ORDER AD...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR AN ORDER AD...) OF 11/08/2019

11/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR AN ORDER AD...) OF 11/08/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

11/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT FOLLOWING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ...) OF 10/09/2019

10/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT FOLLOWING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ...) OF 10/09/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT FOLLOWING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ...)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT FOLLOWING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO DEPARTMENT ...) OF 09/23/2019

9/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO DEPARTMENT ...) OF 09/23/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO DEPARTMENT ...)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO DEPARTMENT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT OF NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN...) OF 09/27/2019

9/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT OF NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN...) OF 09/27/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT OF NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN...)

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT OF NON-PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, KING OF FANS, INC., AND DEFENDANT, CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., INC., FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL

9/3/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, KING OF FANS, INC., AND DEFENDANT, CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., INC., FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL

Notice of Ruling

9/3/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS KING OF FANS, INC. & CHIEN...)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS KING OF FANS, INC. & CHIEN...)

Notice of Ruling

8/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, KING OF FANS, INC., DEFENDANT CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., INC., AND MEAGHER & GEER, P.L.L.P. FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING DAVID E. BRIDGES, ESQ

8/28/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, KING OF FANS, INC., DEFENDANT CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES CO., LTD., INC., AND MEAGHER & GEER, P.L.L.P. FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING DAVID E. BRIDGES, ESQ

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kings of Fans, Inc. (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Trial and Final Status Conference); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (FOR AN ORDER ADMITTING DAVIDE BRIDGES, ESQ. AND CHAD J. STEPAN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketOrder (on Application of Deft, King of Fans, Inc., Defendant Chien Luen Industries Co., Ltd., Inc., and Meagher & Geer, PLLP for and Order Admitting David E. Brdiges, Esq. and Chad J. Stepan, Esq. of Meagher & Geer, LLP as Counsel Pro Hac Vice); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice FOR AN ORDER AD...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice FOR AN ORDER AD...) of 11/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT AIR VENT INC. ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Air Vent, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION, NEGLIGENCE, INDEMNITY AND BREACH OF WARRANTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8321 Hearing Date: April 29, 2022 Dept: A

The instant action arises from a claim of subrogation alleged by Plaintiff State Farm Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) as against Defendant Air Vent, Inc. (“Air Vent”); Powermax Electric Co., Ltd., Guangdong (“Powermax”); King of Fans, Inc. (“KOF”); and Chen Luen Industries Co., Ltd., Inc. (“CLI” and together the “Defendants”).

Plaintiff filed the Complaint on January 03, 2018, alleging four (4) causes of action sounding in: (1) Subrogation; (2) Negligence; (3) Indemnity; and (4) Breach of Warranty.

Air Vent filed a Cross-Complaint ("AXC") against Powermax, KOF, and CLI on August 23, 2018, alleging four (4) causes of action sounding in: (1) Strict Products Liability; (2) Equitable Indemnity; (3) Equitable Apportionment; and (4) Declaratory Relief.

KOF filed a Cross-Complaint ("KXC") against Air Vent on November 14, 2018, alleging three (3) causes of action sounding in: (1) Implied Indemnification; (2) Contribution; and (3) Declaratory Relief.

On March 20, 2022, the Court received the Motion to Dismiss AXC filed by Powermax. The Court has not received any opposition or reply.

On April 15, 2022, the Court received a Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on the Motion to Dismiss AXC filed by Powermax.

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Powermax moves for an order dismissing the AXC insofar as it is asserted against Powermax.

ANALYSIS:

Stipulated Continuance – As Powermax filed a stipulation for continuance signed by both Powermax and Air Vent, the Court continues the instant matter to July 8, 2022.

---

RECOMMENDED RULING:

In the event the parties submit on this tentative ruling, or a party requests a signed order or the court in its discretion elects to sign a formal order, the following form will be either electronically signed or signed in hard copy and entered into the court’s records.

ORDER

Defendant/Cross-Complainant Powermax's Motion to Dismiss came on regularly for hearing on April 29, 2022, with appearances/submissions as noted in the minute order for said hearing, and the court, being fully advised in the premises, did then and there rule as follows:

THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS CONTINUED TO JULY 8, 2022.

DATE:

JUDGE



Case Number: ****8321    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: A

Calendar 11  Motion pro hac vice

GRANT



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHIEN LUEN INDUSTRIES, CO, LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where AIR VENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant