This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 13:22:46 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND FIRE INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND FIRE INSURANCE was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8806

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

GIRARD PAULA

Respondents and Defendants

BROAN NUTONE LLC

DOES 1 TO 40

A. O. SMITH CORPORATION

BROAN-NUTONE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

PILLEMER DAVID B. ESQ.

PILLEMER DAVID BERNARD ESQ.

PRESSMAN CHARLES

PILLEMER DAVID B.

Defendant Attorneys

NIELSEN JOHN

DOODY PETER STIRLING

GONNELLA JOSEPH ANTHONY

YUKEVICH JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & PROPOSED ORDER

8/17/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & PROPOSED ORDER

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER [DATED 10/19/2020 IN CASE NUMBER 19STCV13819]

10/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER [DATED 10/19/2020 IN CASE NUMBER 19STCV13819]

Notice of Ruling

10/19/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/12/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/23/2020

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/24/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

1/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT

12/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

12/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11/21/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

11/22/2019: Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference & Proposed Order); Filed by Paula Girard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Filed by A. O. SMITH CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paula Girard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION, NEGLIGENCE, INDEMNITY AND BREACH OF WARRANTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1ST); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A. O. Smith Corporation is a litigant