This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 23:53:47 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION VS JACKIE LEE KEPHART

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JACKIE LEE KEPHART. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4819

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KEPHART JACKIE LEE DBA ABLE AIR SERVICES

ABLE AIR SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILLEMER DAVID BERNARD

Defendant Attorney

SARACYAN MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/27/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

8/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ALLOW U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE ON BEHALF OF ABLE AIR SERVICES

10/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ALLOW U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE ON BEHALF OF ABLE AIR SERVICES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

11/12/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/12/2021: Cross-Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [proposed] Order to Allow U.s. Specialty Insurance Company to Intervene on Behalf of Able Air Services); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management conference); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILLEMER DAVID B.