Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2020 at 00:38:25 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 STATE FARM GENERAL INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7778

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO.

Defendant

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOURO JENNY R

Defendant Attorney

STANLEY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

6/24/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

5/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

5/23/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VENUE

5/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VENUE

Complaint

5/22/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF VENUE); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INS. CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOURO JENNY ROSE