This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2019 at 16:14:46 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND VS YNON KREIZ

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YNON KREIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4438

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendant

KREIZ YNON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN II CHARLES H.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/2/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Related Case

5/16/2019: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for

4/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

PI General Order

4/26/2019: PI General Order

Summons

4/25/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/25/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • PI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN CHARLES H. II ESQ