Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2019 at 16:37:58 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6468

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendants

MONTANA AVENUE CAPITAL PARTNERS

2400 MARINE AVENUE LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN II CHARLES H.

Attorney at State Compensation Insurance Fund

P.O. Box 28917

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

5/24/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for

5/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Related Case

3/5/2019: Notice of Related Case

Other -

2/28/2019: Other -

Certificate of Mailing for

2/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Summons

2/26/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/26/2019: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement) of 05/24/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN CHARLES H. II ESQ