This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2019 at 04:25:39 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND VS JOSE ROBERTO AMAYA RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE ROBERTO AMAYA RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0285

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ JOSE ROBERTO AMAYA

AMAYA TRUCKING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN II CHARLES H.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice

4/29/2019: Notice

Summons

4/12/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/12/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Does 11); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF PENDING ACTION); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN CHARLES H. II ESQ