Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 00:15:46 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND VS CONSUELO MEDINA DIAZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CONSUELO MEDINA DIAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2687

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendants

DIAZ PEDROZA FRANCISCA

MEDINA DIAZ CONSUELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN CHARLES H.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/26/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

1/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/28/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Pending Action); Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN CHARLES H. II ESQ