This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2023 at 00:03:11 (UTC).

STARSTONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 STARSTONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6080

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARSTONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC. AKA THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF BAKERSFIELD

ORANGE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC.

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAKAMAKI FRANCIS T.

Defendant Attorneys

COHN JONATHON E.

PICKETT TISH R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/7/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Receipt for Transmitted Record - RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

3/20/2023: Receipt for Transmitted Record - RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON DEFENDANT'S RELATED CASES BY LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

3/20/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON DEFENDANT'S RELATED CASES BY LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE; NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

3/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE; NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

Case Management Statement

3/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/ TRIAL

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/ TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO LASC COURT ORDER

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO LASC COURT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO LASC COURT ORDER

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO LASC COURT ORDER

Case Management Statement

3/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH TUCKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

3/20/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH TUCKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON DEFENDANTS RELATED CASES BY LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

3/20/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON DEFENDANTS RELATED CASES BY LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/20/2023: Minute Order

Notice of Outgoing Transfer - NOTICE OF TRANSFER ( OUT)

3/20/2023: Notice of Outgoing Transfer - NOTICE OF TRANSFER ( OUT)

Minute Order

3/20/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/20/2023: Minute Order

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Starstone National Insurance Company on 03/20/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Starstone National Insurance Company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Starstone National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAddress for Tish R. Pickett (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Jonathon E. Cohn (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Polsinelli to Polsinelli LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAddress for Jonathon E. Cohn (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Register of Actions: Exact Name: Register of Actions ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Starstone National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties: Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant), Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant), Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for all Purposes and Notice of Order to Show Cause Re CRC Rule 3.110 and Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Starstone National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDefendants Answer to Starstone National Insurance Company's Complaint for Money; Breach of Agreement; Common Counts; Filed by: Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant); Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 03/20/2023 to 11/18/2021 ; As To Parties changed from Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant), Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant), Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant) to Orange Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant), Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant), Bakersfield Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 03/20/2023 to 11/18/2021 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Transfer In Case Documents: Status Date changed from 03/20/2023 to 11/18/2021 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less