This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2020 at 08:21:44 (UTC).

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY VS ROLYS TRUCKING INC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 STARR INDEMNITY LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROLYS TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9331

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

ROLY'S TRUCKING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATTHIESEN WICKER & LEHRER S.C.

AZIZ ZAHRA H.

Defendant Attorney

JACOBSEN KAREN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

6/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/11/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Witness List

2/7/2020: Witness List

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/7/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF ...)

2/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF ...)

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES

2/10/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

1/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIO

12/30/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIO

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQUE

12/30/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQUE

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUESTS FOR SANC

12/30/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ROLYS TRUCKING INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUESTS FOR SANC

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/6/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

4/5/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

8/1/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

6/8/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT - WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION CAL. LABOR CODE SECTION 3852 ET SEQ.

6/8/2018: COMPLAINT - WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION CAL. LABOR CODE SECTION 3852 ET SEQ.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Hearing03/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Hearing02/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by Roly's Trucking Inc. Erroneously Sued As Roly's Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference Dates; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Roly's Trucking Inc. Erroneously Sued As Roly's Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, Final Status Conference and Related Deadlines) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Roly's Trucking Inc. Erroneously Sued As Roly's Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roly's Trucking Inc. Erroneously Sued As Roly's Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION CAL. LABOR CODE SECTION 3852 ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709331    Hearing Date: February 10, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

starr indemnity & liability company,

Plaintiff,

v.

roly’s trucking, inc.,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC709331

Hearing Date: February 10, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

Defendant Roly’s Trucking Inc. (“Defendant”) moves to compel responses from Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One (“FROG”); and (3) Special Interrogatories, Set One (“SROG”). The motions are granted.

Defendant served the discovery at issue on Plaintiff by mail on April 5, 2019. Defendant offered multiple extensions of time to respond, up to November 18, 2019. As of the filing date of these motions, Defendant has not received responses from Plaintiff. There is no opposition to the motion, and there is nothing in the record to suggest that Plaintiff has complied with its discovery obligations. Accordingly, the motions to compel responses to the RPD, FROG, and SROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve responses to Defendant’s RPD, FROG, and SROG, without objections, within 30 days of service of this order.

Defendant seeks sanctions in connection with the motions. The Court concludes that Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. The Court awards sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of $1,400, which represents eight hours of attorney time to prepare the motions and attend the hearing at $175 per hour. Defendants did not seek reimbursement of the filing fees.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the RPD, FROG, and SROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff is ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,400 to Defendant, by and through counsel, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Defendant is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: February 10, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court