This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:48:42 (UTC).

STAR CENTURY PICTURES, ET AL VS DARK PLANET PICTURES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 STAR CENTURY PICTURES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DARK PLANET PICTURES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO. LTD...

PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL A BRITISH VIRGIN...

Defendants

DARK PLANET PICTURES LLC...

LEGENDS FILM CO LLC...

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

JOINER ADAM AN INDIVIDUAL

JOINER ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. REED MERCADO

J. BARRETT MARUM

MARUM J. BARRETT

MERCADO M. REED

 

Court Documents

Other -

7/25/2018: Other -

Minute Order

10/9/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

10/9/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

10/9/2018: Minute Order

Other -

7/16/2018: Other -

Notice

10/24/2018: Notice

Notice of Ruling

7/25/2018: Notice of Ruling

Order

8/9/2018: Order

Order

10/15/2018: Order

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice (of Entry of Order); Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Order (Denying Homestead Exemption); Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • at 08:33 AM in Department M; (Motion Hearing) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Motion Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (Re: Defendant's Homestead Exemption Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Motion Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Order FOR SALE DWELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied without prejudice) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Summons; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by STAR CENTURY PICTURES CO., LTD... (Plaintiff); A BRITISH VIRGIN... PGA YUNGPARK CAPITAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.