This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 20:30:05 (UTC).

STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS T.R.E. ELEVATOR CORP.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against T R E ELEVATOR CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0186

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

T.R.E. ELEVATOR CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RIFFLE EDWARD J

DOUCETTE BRADLEY D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GABRIEL JONATHAN G

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/25/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

3/4/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/4/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

4/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/27/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Case Management Statement

7/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by T.R.E. ELEVATOR CORP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by T.R.E. ELEVATOR CORP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where T R E ELEVATOR CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABRIEL JONATHAN GRANT