This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:55:13 (UTC).

STANDARD DRYWALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 STANDARD DRYWALL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO, JON R. TAKASUGI and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8063

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

JON R. TAKASUGI

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STANDARD DRYWALL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STANDARD DRYWALL INC.

Defendants

OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC

L.A. DOWNTOWN INVESTMENT LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PAN-PACIFIC MECHANICAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BAPKO METAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KOVACH LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ADVANCED CABLE SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PHL INC. DOING BUSINESS AS VNSM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ENCLOS CORP A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE NEVELL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

TROYER CONTRACTING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MASONRY CONCEPTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SHAW & SONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Not Classified By Court

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANTZ NOWELL

Defendant Attorneys

PADILLA JOSE L JR.

BLANCHARD PHIL

ELIOPOULOS WILLIAM

MCCARTHY MICHAEL ELLIOT

ORTMANN DALE A.

PADILLA JOSE LUIS JR

RESURRECCION TREVOR

TATE THERESA CRAWFORD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

4/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL A CANTOR ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ARBITRATE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND EXHIBITS

4/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL A CANTOR ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ARBITRATE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND EXHIBITS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEN W CHOI ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ARBITRATE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND EXHIBITS

4/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEN W CHOI ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ARBITRATE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND EXHIBITS

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/7/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Lifting on Stay of Discovery) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Standard Drywall, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 08/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Standard Drywall, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Webcor Construction, LP (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Standard Drywall, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Standard Drywall, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Standard Drywall, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOVACH LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHAW & SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCLOS CORP is a litigant