This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2021 at 12:02:41 (UTC).

STAN LAWRENCE, ET AL. VS COLIN QUINN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 STAN LAWRENCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COLIN QUINN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1837

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAWRENCEE INT'L CORP.

LAWRENCE STAN

Defendants

CQE INC.

QUINN COLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDS RONALD

Defendant Attorney

MEISELAS BENJAMIN JARED

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Status Report

6/15/2021: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / STATUS REPORT RE: REMAND TO FEDE...)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / STATUS REPORT RE: REMAND TO FEDE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / STATUS REPORT RE: REMAND TO FEDE...) OF 06/17/2021

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / STATUS REPORT RE: REMAND TO FEDE...) OF 06/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL / ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL / ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/13/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/15/2020

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/27/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

11/22/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/17/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/21/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Stan Lawrence (Plaintiff); Lawrencee Int'l Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (/ Status Report RERemand to Federal Court) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference / Status Report RE: Remand to Fede...) of 06/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference / Status Report RE: Remand to Fede...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Stan Lawrence (Plaintiff); Lawrencee Int'l Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Colin Quinn (Defendant); CQE, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Colin Quinn (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (/ Entry of Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal / Entry of Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Colin Quinn (Defendant); CQE, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stan Lawrence (Plaintiff); Lawrencee Int'l Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stan Lawrence (Plaintiff); Lawrencee Int'l Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stan Lawrence (Plaintiff); Lawrencee Int'l Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less