This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 04:59:22 (UTC).

STACY DILLON VS SHAPA INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 STACY DILLON filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SHAPA INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8739

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DILLON STACY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

SHAPA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER II ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/8/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/8/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/8/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2023
  • Hearing11/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Stacy Dillon (Plaintiff); As to: SHAPA INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/19/2023; Service Cost: 197.41; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stacy Dillon (Plaintiff); As to: SHAPA INC., a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stacy Dillon (Plaintiff); As to: SHAPA INC., a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stacy Dillon (Plaintiff); As to: SHAPA INC., a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 100, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less