This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 17:11:13 (UTC).

STACY CURTIS VS JANIE COHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 STACY CURTIS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JANIE COHEN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9226

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURTIS STACY

Defendants

COHEN JANIE

COHEN ROBERT

JANIE COHEN AS TRUSTEE

ROBERT COHEN AS TRUSTEE

ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORENFELD DAVID K. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS CAROLYN C.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

3/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE IF CASE NUMBERS 22STCV19226 AND 22STCV36429 SH...)

3/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE IF CASE NUMBERS 22STCV19226 AND 22STCV36429 SH...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE IF CASE NUMBERS 22STCV19226 AND 22STCV36429 SH...) OF 03/13/2023

3/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE IF CASE NUMBERS 22STCV19226 AND 22STCV36429 SH...) OF 03/13/2023

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Related Case

3/8/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE POS...)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE POS...)

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONSENT FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

1/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONSENT FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Case Management Statement

1/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

11/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Case Management Statement

11/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/13/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2023
  • Hearing11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Re: if case Numbers 22STCV19226 and 22STCV36429

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from JANIE COHEN (Defendant), ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST (Defendant), JANIE COHEN, as trustee (Defendant), ROBERT COHEN, as trustee (Defendant) to JANIE COHEN, as trustee (Defendant), ROBERT COHEN, as trustee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from JANIE COHEN (Defendant), ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST (Defendant) to ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal of Defendant Robert and Janie Cohen TRS Robert and Janie Trust scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Re: if case Numbers 22STCV19226 and 22STCV36429 scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- JANIE COHEN, as trustee (Defendant): Organization Name changed from JANIE COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST to JANIE COHEN, as trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STACY CURTIS (Plaintiff); As to: JANIE COHEN (Defendant); ROBERT COHEN (Defendant); ROBERT COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STACY CURTIS (Plaintiff); As to: JANIE COHEN (Defendant); ROBERT COHEN (Defendant); ROBERT COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STACY CURTIS (Plaintiff); As to: JANIE COHEN (Defendant); ROBERT COHEN (Defendant); ROBERT COHEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT AND JANIE COHEN TRS ROBERT AND JANIE TRUST (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less