This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 08:47:14 (UTC).

STACY CASTRO VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 STACY CASTRO filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0830

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTRO STACY

Defendants

GALPIN VOLKSWAGEN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

OH ROBERT SAEHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/7/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/8/2022: Answer

Answer

11/8/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); As to: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Galpin Volkswagen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff); As to: Galpin Volkswagen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 81.08; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/10/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Galpin Volkswagen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Galpin Volkswagen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stacy Castro (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Galpin Volkswagen LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALPIN VOLKSWAGEN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.