Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:33:31 (UTC).

STACEY, ROBERT LEE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 STACEY, ROBERT LEE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, LESLEY C., WADA, ROBERT S and JOHNSON, BARBARA R.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1369

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREEN, LESLEY C.

WADA, ROBERT S

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STACEY DONALD W

Decedent

STACEY ROBERT LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KAWAHARA BERT YUKIHARU

 

Court Documents

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

3/1/2019: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Order - Ex Parte Order for Increasing Bond and Elimination

3/6/2018: Order - Ex Parte Order for Increasing Bond and Elimination

Minute Order

4/6/2018: Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

6/27/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Report

6/28/2018: Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Report

Bond - US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

3/21/2018: Bond - US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Letters (Initial)

2/15/2018: Letters (Initial)

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

12/20/2017: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service - Notice of Ex Parte Hearing

3/1/2018: Proof of Service - Notice of Ex Parte Hearing

Order - Order Approving First and Final Report of Administrator

10/26/2018: Order - Order Approving First and Final Report of Administrator

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

11/13/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial)

12/20/2017: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) - Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

12/26/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

1/5/2018: Proof of Publication

Order - Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account

4/3/2018: Order - Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

6/29/2018: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application to Increase Bond

2/28/2018: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application to Increase Bond

Order - Probate

2/8/2018: Order - Probate

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • in Probate Department 11, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Order (Order Approving First and Final Report of Administrator ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Account - Final or Waiver (First and Final Report ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2018
  • in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) (Petition for Letters of Administration (Initial) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less