This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 03:01:21 (UTC).

STACEY GUTIERREZ VS MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 STACEY GUTIERREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9174

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ STACEY

Defendants

MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE

MALMGREN IRENE

ALI IBRAHIM "ABE"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BANUELOS OMERO

Defendant Attorney

WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ALL RELATED DATES; PROPOSED ORDER); Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Mount San Antonio College (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2018
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Second Amended Complaint; Filed by Mount San Antonio College (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Demurrer sustained without leave) -

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-10-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-08-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stacey Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.