Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 05:29:53 (UTC).

STACE ZACHARIA VS BRIAN EUGENE WILLIAM COX

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 STACE ZACHARIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN EUGENE WILLIAM COX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5387

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZACHARIA STACE

Defendant

COX BRIAN EUGENE WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAYNHAM KENNETH E.

Defendant Attorney

GALANG BRITTON P.

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/10/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brian Eugene William Cox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Brian Eugene William Cox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Stace Zacharia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stace Zacharia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stace Zacharia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stace Zacharia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAYNHAM KENNETH EDWARD