Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 06:23:04 (UTC).

ST. PATRICK'S DAY ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP VS HUBNET EXPRESS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ST PATRICK'S DAY ASSOCIATES, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against HUBNET EXPRESS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0276

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. PATRICK'S DAY ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

HUBNET EXPRESS CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOROWITZ ELSA M

 

Court Documents

Application for Order to Post

4/20/2021: Application for Order to Post

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

4/21/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Posting

4/28/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

4/12/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HUBNET EXPRESS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

4/9/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HUBNET EXPRESS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/9/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by St. Patrick's Day Associates, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by St. Patrick's Day Associates, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by St. Patrick's Day Associates, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by St. Patrick's Day Associates, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by St. Patrick's Day Associates, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by St. Patrick's Day Associates, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Hubnet Express Corporation, a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. PATRICK'S DAY ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOROWITZ ELSA M