This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 07:18:53 (UTC).

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER VS THE ESTATE OF WESLEY L. TODD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 ST JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE ESTATE OF WESLEY L TODD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9272

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER

Defendants

THE ESTATE OF WESLEY L. TODD

TODD DORIS J.

TODD GARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRINSON KATIE

BRINSON KATIE J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATIE J. BRINSON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATIE J. BRINSON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice of Ruling

6/7/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

5/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTR...)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTR...)

Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

3/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

2/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/25/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

12/4/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Entry of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT OSC RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Katie J. Brinson In Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (and/or Order to Show Cause re Entry of Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Order to Show Cause re Entr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by St. John of God Retirement And Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRINSON KATIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRINSON KATIE J.