Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:30:26 (UTC).

ST JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER VS STATE OF CA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 ST JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against STATE OF CA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5245

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER

Defendants and Respondents

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

DOES 1 TO 20

STATE OF CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND HUMAN

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NATOLI-DUFFY NOELLE M. ESQ.

NATOLI NOELLE M.

NEWMAN TARA LYNN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

NEWMAN TARA L. DEPUTY ATTY GEN.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

12/18/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

3/12/2019: Declaration

Notice

3/12/2019: Notice

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

4/5/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

4/9/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Opposition

4/17/2019: Opposition

Request for Judicial Notice

4/17/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection

4/23/2019: Objection

Declaration

4/25/2019: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

5/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel

5/23/2019: Motion to Compel

Reply

5/29/2019: Reply

Opposition

6/5/2019: Opposition

Opposition

6/19/2019: Opposition

Brief

6/25/2019: Brief

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/25/2018: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Ermelinda Hernandez, # 12257)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) of 07/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Brief (Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings); Filed by Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by State of California, Health and Human Services Agency (Defendant); Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings); Filed by St. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to requests for admission (set one)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to special interrogatories number 1 through 8 and 32 through 55 and request for sanctions) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to requests for production nos. 1 through 23, 41 through 44 and 46, request for sanctions) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be non-Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • in Department 309, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Order-Complex Determination - Case Determined to be non-Complex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • COMPLAINT TO: (1) CONTEST CITATION AND PROPOSED ASSESSMENT OF CIVIL PENALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by St. John of God Retirement and Care (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWMAN TARA L. DEPUTY ATTY GEN.