Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 07:41:08 (UTC).

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ORLEANS HANKINS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ST JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORLEANS HANKINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4239

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTER

Defendants

FULTZ TOWANNA

HANKINS ORLEANS

WILLIAMS JONNESHA

FULTZ ANNIE

ESTATE OF ORLEAN HANKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NATOLI NOELLE M

NATOLI-DUFFY NOELLE M. ESQ.

NATOLI-DUFFY NOELLE M.

MENDOZA MARISSA E.

Defendant Attorneys

LONG MATTHEW

THOMAS EMANUEL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

8/4/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

7/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

Answer

3/25/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/9/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

3/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

1/30/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

2/19/2020: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/18/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/6/2019: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Hearing09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Towanna Fultz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Towanna Fultz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Towanna Fultz (Defendant); Jonnesha Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ST. John of God Retirement and Care Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOHN OF GOD RETIREMENT AND CARE CENTE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS EMANUEL