This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 15:55:58 (UTC).

SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3165

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Defendants

UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UTILITY TRAILER SALES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC.

UNIVERSAL EXCHANGE INC.

JAY MEHTA INC. D.B.A JM OIL

CHEVRON CORPORATION

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

UTILITY TRAILER SALES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC.

UNIVERSAL EXCHANGE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER VERNON C. ESQ.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS CHARLES L.

KIRKPATRICK CHERYL ANN

LEVIN JASON

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CROSE JOHN A. JR.

KIRKPATRICK CHERYL ANN

HARRIS CHARLES L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/5/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/28/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/13/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/17/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

2/24/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Demand for Jury Trial

3/2/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/19/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/19/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

7/7/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/29/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES

7/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/4/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2024
  • Hearing04/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Utility Trailer Sales of Southern California, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by CHEVRON CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by CHEVRON CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CHEVRON CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Utility Trailer Sales of Southern California, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata); Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS, INC., a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL EXCHANGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UTILITY TRAILER SALES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SSI REFRIGERATED EXPRESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JAY MEHTA INC. is a litigant