This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 19:03:41 (UTC).

S&S ACTIVEWEAR, LLC VS ACTIVE HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 S S ACTIVEWEAR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACTIVE HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0465

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S&S ACTIVEWEAR LLC

Defendant

ACTIVE HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Proof of Personal Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

11/16/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Default Judgment

11/16/2020: Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

11/16/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case

11/16/2020: Summary of the Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/10/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by S&S Activewear, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&S Activewear LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Active Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO