This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 03:35:26 (UTC).

SPITZ, KRISTIN VS SPITZ, GRANT

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 SPITZ, KRISTIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SPITZ, GRANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS, HOLLY A., JUHAS, MARK A., RIFF, LAWRENCE P. and COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8392

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS, HOLLY A.

JUHAS, MARK A.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SPITZ KRISTIN

Respondent

SPITZ GRANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MOORE ISOLDE L.

WANGER DARLENE SHERYL

Respondent Attorneys

WALLER MARSHALL WILLIAM II

NAKOS JOSEPH DOUGLAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • Hearing09/24/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 2B at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2B, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketRequest - Continue Hearing; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder (On Request To Continue Hearing )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Re: Decl of Darlene S. Wagner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Darlene S. Wagner, ESQ; ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk (Mailed to ares :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE ISOLDE L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WANGER DARLENE SHERYL