This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 16:43:16 (UTC).

SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC VS GUADALUPE CARDENAS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUADALUPE CARDENAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4023

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendants

CARDENAS GUADALUPE

KUBO BENJAMIN

KUBO REALTY & INVESTMENTS GROUP

CARDENAS GUADALUPE AKA GUADALUPE RENDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ITO KEN ICHI

EUSTERMANN JOHN MATTHEW

FORBERG TONY

Defendant Attorneys

GUERRERO JOSUE CRISTOBAL

O'FARRILL ANTHONY JOHN

GROSS KENNETH I

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/4/2021: Answer

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) DEFENDANTS' JOINDER TO IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIOIN FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) DEFENDANTS' JOINDER TO IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIOIN FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling

3/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

10/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

Reply - REPLY OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/9/2020: Reply - REPLY OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE OF...)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE OF...)

Notice of Ruling

12/4/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE OF...)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE OF...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT)

7/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE DEFAULT)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/31/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/13/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Hearing12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Hearing10/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Benjamin Kubo (Defendant); Kubo Realty & Investments Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Guadalupe Cardenas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (3rd)); Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Spectrum Holdings and Development, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM HOLDINGS AND DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ITO KEN ICHI