This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 09:19:19 (UTC).

SPECTRA COMPANY VS CHRISTOPHER PALMER

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 SPECTRA COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER PALMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1139

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRA COMPANY

Defendant

PALMER CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RIFFLE EDWARD J.

WITZMANN JUSTIN D.

Defendant Attorney

RESSER BERNARD M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/6/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Settlement

3/9/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/10/2020

3/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/13/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

2/4/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/14/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/4/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Christopher Palmer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christopher Palmer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITZMANN, JUSTIN D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIFFLE EDWARD JOSEPH