This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 14:09:19 (UTC).

SPECTRA COMPANY VS 940 FIGUEROA, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 SPECTRA COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 940 FIGUEROA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8006

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRA COMPANY

Defendant

940 FIGUEROA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WITZMANN JUSTIN D.

Attorney at Collins Collins Muir & Stewart

1100 El Centro St.

South Pasadena, CA 91030

WITZMANN JUSTIN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice

12/19/2018: Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case

12/10/2018: Notice of Related Case

Unknown

12/10/2018: Unknown

Summons

12/10/2018: Summons

Complaint

12/10/2018: Complaint

Declaration

1/17/2019: Declaration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

1/17/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Unknown

2/5/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

2/5/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

2/5/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

6/19/2019: Notice

Request for Dismissal

6/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Notice (of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)); Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • at 09:14 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Staying Action and Referring Matters to Contractual Binding Arbitration); Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Declaration (OF JUSTIN WEIZMAN); Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Declaration (OF TIMOTHY HARRIS); Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice (Of Recording of Pendency of Legal Action (Lis Pendens)); Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Spectra Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WITZMANN, JUSTIN D.