This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 14:52:36 (UTC).

SPECTRA COMPANY VS 1305 2ND STREET SM, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 SPECTRA COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 1305 2ND STREET SM, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1940

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRA COMPANY

Defendant

1305 2ND STREET SM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUCETTE BRADLEY

RIFFLE EDWARD J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/16/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/23/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AND REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF SPECTRA COMPANY AND DEFENDANT 1305 2ND STREET SM LL

5/4/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AND REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF SPECTRA COMPANY AND DEFENDANT 1305 2ND STREET SM LL

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (AND REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF SPECTRA COMPANY AND DEFENDANT 1305 2ND STREET SM LLC PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6); Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SPECTRA COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where 1305 2ND STREET SM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIFFLE EDWARD JOSEPH