This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2020 at 00:38:58 (UTC).

SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., A WASHINGTON S-CORPORATION VS SWAN BAY SOLUTIONS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC , A WASHINGTON S-CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SWAN BAY SOLUTIONS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0126

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALTY RENTALS LLC. A WASHINGTON S-CORPORATION

Defendant

SWAN BAY SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVUN ROY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/28/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/29/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/28/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Summary of the Case

5/28/2020: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

8/26/2020: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SPECIALTY RENTALS, LLC., a Washington S-Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVUN ROY ALAN