Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 00:16:14 (UTC).

SPANAKOS, JOHNNY VS ECK, BRITTANY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 SPANAKOS, JOHNNY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ECK, BRITTANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WEINER, TIMOTHY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0432

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WEINER, TIMOTHY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SPANAKOS JOHNNY

Respondent

ECK BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

Respondent Attorney

LEBEAU JEFFERY OLIVER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - DV-100, DV-109, DV-110

4/15/2021: Proof of Service - DV-100, DV-109, DV-110

Minute Order

4/20/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/20/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/20/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Supplemental - To Restraining Order Petition

6/1/2021: Supplemental - To Restraining Order Petition

Response - Domestic Violence

6/1/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/30/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/30/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

3/30/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3/30/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

3/30/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 8:30 AM in As Assigned (S14,S15,S16) at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSupplemental (To Restraining Order Petition ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Weiner, Timothy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (DV-100, DV-109, DV-110 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE BEAU JEFFREY O. ESQ.