This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 02:07:54 (UTC).

SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP VS SLS CONSULTING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF CORP , DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SLS CONSULTING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1451

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER A PROF. CORP. DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP

Defendants

SLS CONSULTING INC.

ZIEGLER SUSAN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ ANTHONY R. JR.

Defendant Attorney

MAHER PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTLING CONFERENCE); Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SLS CONSULTING, INC. (Defendant); SUSAN L. ZIEGLER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SLS CONSULTING, INC. (Defendant); SUSAN L. ZIEGLER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER, A PROF. CORP., DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST LAW CENTER A PROF. CORP. DBA SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ ANTHONY R. JR. ESQ.