This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 18:07:44 (UTC).

SOUTHSIDE CORPORATION VS WILLIAM J BARKETT

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 SOUTHSIDE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM J BARKETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5723

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOUTHSIDE CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

BARKETT WILLIAM J.

DOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SAMOSKA WILLIAM M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/28/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

2/26/2019: Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

Minute Order -

2/20/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/9/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

4/16/2018: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

ANSWER TO FIRST AMEMED COMPLAINT

10/17/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMEMED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/10/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM BARKETT TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/4/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM BARKETT TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

5/11/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/28/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/28/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

8/2/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

8/21/2017: Minute Order -

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Southside Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 47; (Trial; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 47; (Trial; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Southside Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Southside Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHSIDE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMOSKA WILLIAM